Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 11:24:26 (UTC).

DAVID ADELIPOUR, ET AL. VS JOSHUA POURGOL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 DAVID ADELIPOUR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSHUA POURGOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8270

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOINIAN JOSEPH

ADELIPOUR DAVID

Defendants

POURGOL JOSHUA

EBRAHIMIAN YOSEF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NAHAI BEHZAD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/31/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE

12/31/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) PROOF OF SERVICE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/17/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by David Adelipour (Plaintiff); Joseph Moinian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) (proof of service); Filed by David Adelipour (Plaintiff); Joseph Moinian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by David Adelipour (Plaintiff); Joseph Moinian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by David Adelipour (Plaintiff); Joseph Moinian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by David Adelipour (Plaintiff); Joseph Moinian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by David Adelipour (Plaintiff); Joseph Moinian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAHAI BEHZAD