This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2019 at 00:32:37 (UTC).

DAVE BARELA VS JASON HU ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 DAVE BARELA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON HU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. KALIN, MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3171

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH R. KALIN

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BARELA DAVE

ZHAO LING SONG

ZHAO LING SONG AKA EDWARD ZHAO

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

HL TRADING GROUP INC

HU JASON

HL TRADING GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

IP CHI LEUNG

IP EDWARD C.

NG HENRY

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HENRY NG - POST MEDIATION STATUS REPORT

11/12/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HENRY NG - POST MEDIATION STATUS REPORT

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

11/12/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Objection - OBJECTION HEARSAY OBJECTION TO USE OF EDWARD IP'S EMAILS BY CROSS-DEFENDANT BARELA AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ZHAO

11/12/2019: Objection - OBJECTION HEARSAY OBJECTION TO USE OF EDWARD IP'S EMAILS BY CROSS-DEFENDANT BARELA AND CROSS-DEFENDANT ZHAO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5); HE...)

11/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5); HE...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

10/11/2018: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

10/11/2018: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF ALL UNSERVED DEFEN...) OF 09/03/2019

9/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF ALL UNSERVED DEFEN...) OF 09/03/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF ALL UNSERVED DEFEN...)

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE DISMISSAL OF ALL UNSERVED DEFEN...)

Order - Dismissal

9/4/2019: Order - Dismissal

Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/26/2019: Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/26/2019: Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE AND SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS, IN THE AMOUNT OF $250, AGA...)

4/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS, IN THE AMOUNT OF $250, AGA...)

Declaration - DECLARATION HENRY NG RE - OSC SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

3/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION HENRY NG RE - OSC SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION NG RE - CM STATEMENT OF 3/11/2019

3/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION NG RE - CM STATEMENT OF 3/11/2019

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • Hearing05/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Hearing05/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); He...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by Jason Hu (Defendant); HL Trading Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of HENRY NG - Post Mediation Status Report); Filed by Jason Hu (Defendant); HL Trading Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketObjection (Hearsay Objection To Use of Edward Ip's Emails By Cross-Defendant Barela and Cross-Defendant ZHAO); Filed by HL Trading Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dave Barela (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF ORAL AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3171    Hearing Date: November 26, 2019    Dept: 74

****3171 DAVE BARELA VS JASON HU ET AL

Cross-defendants Barela and Zhao’s Motions to Set Aside and Vacate Default

TENTATIVE RULING: The motions are granted. The defaults are vacated. Cross-defendants are to file an answer to the cross-complaint within 20 days.

Cross-defendants have established a reasonable belief that the time to respond was extended while they pursued settlement negotiations.

The motions are granted. The defaults are vacated. Cross-defendants are to file an answer to the cross-complaint within 20 days.