This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 01:04:12 (UTC).

DASH TWO, INC. VS FOLAMI ARI HARRISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 DASH TWO, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against FOLAMI ARI HARRISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3431

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DASH TWO INC.

SESTO GINO

DASH TWO INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GHOSTQODE LLC

HARRISON FOLAMI ARI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

SEVERINO CEDRIC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JONES TRACY

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/24/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

4/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

2/5/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

2/6/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT ...)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER RE: HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/13/2021

1/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

1/27/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER (WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/27/2020: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Mail

11/13/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/16/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

8/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/19/2020: Complaint

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by DASH TWO, INC. (Plaintiff); FOLAMI ARI HARRISON (Defendant); GHOSTQODE LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Hearing on Demurrer - without ...) of 02/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Hearing on Demurrer - without ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by DASH TWO, INC (Cross-Defendant); Gino Sesto (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by FOLAMI ARI HARRISON (Defendant); GHOSTQODE LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by FOLAMI ARI HARRISON (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FOLAMI ARI HARRISON (Defendant); GHOSTQODE LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DASH TWO, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DASH TWO, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DASH TWO, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DASH TWO, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DASH TWO, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DASH TWO, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEVERINO CEDRIC