This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:40:03 (UTC).

DARYOUSH ARYAPOUR VS KARSTEN SIGBAND ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 DARYOUSH ARYAPOUR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KARSTEN SIGBAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7532

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARYAPOUR DARYOUSH

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

ANDERSON BARBARA

PERKINS NATHANIEL

SIGBAND KARSTEN

DOES 1 TO 25

ENRIQUEZ KRISTINA

SIGBAND MITCHELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MAZZA STEVEN L.

Defendant Attorney

NICOLSON LAW GROUP PC

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/5/2018: Unknown

CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/5/2018: CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/5/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANTS KARSTEN STGBAND AND MITCHELL SIGBAND?S CROSS- COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS BARBARA ANDERSON, NATHANIEL PERKINS, KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ AND ROES I THRO

2/5/2018: DEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANTS KARSTEN STGBAND AND MITCHELL SIGBAND?S CROSS- COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS BARBARA ANDERSON, NATHANIEL PERKINS, KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ AND ROES I THRO

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/26/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/3/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

5/3/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/3/2018: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

5/3/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY; DECLARATORY RELIEF AND APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/3/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

5/4/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/4/2018: DEFENDANT KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/4/2018: DEFENDANT KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/4/2018: DEFENDANT KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by BARBARA ANDERSON (Legacy Party); NATHANIEL PERKINS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Cross-Complaint filed on 05/03/2018 as to Kristina Enriquez only); Filed by BARBARA ANDERSON (Legacy Party); NATHANIEL PERKINS (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to the Cross-Complaint filed on 2/5/18 as to Kristina Enriquez only); Filed by KARSTEN SIGBAND (Legacy Party); MITCHELL SIGBAND (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT KR1STINA ENRIQUEZ'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by KARSTEN SIGBAND (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT AND CROSS- COMPLAINANTS KARSTEN STGBAND AND MITCHELL SIGBAND S CROSS- COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS BARBARA ANDERSON, NATHANIEL PERKINS, KRISTINA ENRIQUEZ AND ROES I THROUGH 10 FOR:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by DARYOUSH ARYAPOUR (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by DARYOUSH ARYAPOUR (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DARYOUSH ARYAPOUR (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7532    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: 2

Aryapour v. Sigband, et al.

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement by Defendants, Barbara Anderson and Nathan Perkins, is GRANTED.

Defendants have met their initial burden. The party asserting lack of good faith has the burden of proof on that issue. Code Civ. Proc. ; 877.6(d); City of Grand Terrace v. Superior Court (1987) 192 Cal.App.3d 1251, 1262. The motion is unopposed and thus there has been no showing that the settlement is not in good faith. The Court thus grants the motion.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.