This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 17:21:20 (UTC).

DARY MEAS VS THE KROGER COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 DARY MEAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0739

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEAS DARY

Defendants

ALPHA BETA COMPANY DBA FOOD 4 LESS

THE KROGER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAVAKOLI PAYAM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/24/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/24/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/24/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2024
  • Hearing06/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2023
  • Hearing12/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2023
  • Hearing12/08/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dary Meas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dary Meas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dary Meas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dary Meas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAVAKOLI PAYAM