This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2020 at 02:40:27 (UTC).

DARRYL STRUCKE VS GOLDEN STATE OVERNIGHT DELIVERY SERVICE INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 DARRYL STRUCKE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GOLDEN STATE OVERNIGHT DELIVERY SERVICE INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8780

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRUCKE DARRYL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ILINK BUSINESS MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GOLDEN STATE OVERNIGHT DELIVERY SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DIAMOND PEO LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

DIAMOND PEO LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVRETOVICH JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

LORENZANA LUIS ENRIQUE

MANOCK CHARLES

Cross Defendant Attorneys

NICKERSON CRAIG D.

SATTARIN JALEH J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

6/18/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/19/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/20/2020

5/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/20/2020

Proof of Service by Mail

5/5/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED DATE AND TIME BY COURT OF ILINK BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED DATE AND TIME BY COURT OF ILINK BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

5/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

5/1/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/27/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/27/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRISTINA ROJAS IN SUPPORT OF ILINK BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRISTINA ROJAS IN SUPPORT OF ILINK BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG D. NICKERSON IN SUPPORT OF ILINK BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG D. NICKERSON IN SUPPORT OF ILINK BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service by Mail

4/29/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

4/29/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/29/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/21/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Darryl Strucke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Darryl Strucke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/20/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF RESCHEDULED DATE AND TIME BY COURT OF ILINK BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION); Filed by ILINK Business Management, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Golden State Overnight Delivery Service Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Golden State Overnight Delivery Service Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Darryl Strucke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Darryl Strucke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Darryl Strucke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Darryl Strucke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Darryl Strucke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Darryl Strucke (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where iLink Business Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DIAMOND PEO LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Golden State Overnight Delivery Service, Inc. is a litigant