Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 12:52:45 (UTC).

DARRYL DAVIS, ET AL. VS CEDRIC WELLS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 DARRYL DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CEDRIC WELLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4295

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIS DARRYL

BANKSTON EVELYN

Defendants

WELLS FLORA

WELLS CEDRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SALDANA KATHRYN

Other Attorneys

CORRAL NATHALIE ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

4/14/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

4/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Answer

3/15/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/22/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/3/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2024
  • Hearing01/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Hearing07/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Not Entered); Filed by Darryl Davis (Plaintiff); Evelyn Bankston (Plaintiff); Cedric Wells (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Firm Name); Filed by Cedric Wells (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cedric Wells (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Darryl Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Darryl Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Darryl Davis (Plaintiff); Evelyn Bankston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Darryl Davis (Plaintiff); Evelyn Bankston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Darryl Davis (Plaintiff); Evelyn Bankston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corral, Natalie E