This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 20:50:48 (UTC).

DARRON HARTLEY VS MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 DARRON HARTLEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3981

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTLEY DARRON

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER DBA OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAHON COLETTE NOELLE

GRUENBERG JOSHUA DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

MOSELY KATHRYN SUE

MOULIN LEE MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by La Brea Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation Re: Transfer of Venue; Order; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Diligence; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Signing of an Order re Change of Venue and Request for payment of Fees; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Darron Hartley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRegister of Actions; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA BREA REHABILITAION CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Menaldino, Colette N