This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 11:54:36 (UTC).

DARREN MICHAEL YOUNG VS NORMAN THEUERKORN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 DARREN MICHAEL YOUNG filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NORMAN THEUERKORN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, RICHARD J. BURDGE JR., FERNANDO L. AENLLE-ROCHA, ELIZABETH R. FEFFER, RICHARD E. RICO and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7260

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

RICHARD J. BURDGE JR.

FERNANDO L. AENLLE-ROCHA

ELIZABETH R. FEFFER

RICHARD E. RICO

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG DARREN MICHAEL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE H. WOOD GROUP

THEUERKORN NORMAN

BLIND DRAGON

INNOVATIVE DINING GROUP LLC

Cross Defendant and Defendant

THEUERKORN NORMAN

Not Classified By Court

KONSTAD ANDREA L.

WILSHIRE CRESCENT HEIGHTS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GHAVIMI AIDIN D.

PARRIS KHAIL A.

Defendant Attorneys

BREMER KEITH G

SALEM JOHNPAUL NAJAH

TANNER FREDERIC TREE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/3/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION) OF 08/13/2021

8/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION) OF 08/13/2021

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/8/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Judicial Notice

12/22/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL

12/22/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC FACT DISCOVERY, EXPERT DISCOVERY, AND MOTION CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIE

12/22/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC FACT DISCOVERY, EXPERT DISCOVERY, AND MOTION CUT-OFF DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC F...) OF 12/23/2021

12/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC F...) OF 12/23/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC F...)

12/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC F...)

Notice of Ruling

12/27/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC F...)

1/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC F...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC F...) OF 01/03/2022

1/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, SPECIFIC F...) OF 01/03/2022

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/3/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Ruling

1/10/2022: Notice of Ruling

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Darren Michael Young on 12/05/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Darren Michael Young as to Norman Theuerkorn, Blind Dragon, The H. Wood Group, and Innovative Dining Group, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Darren Michael Young (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Innovative Dining Group, LLC on 07/12/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Innovative Dining Group, LLC as to Norman Theuerkorn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Innovative Dining Group, LLC (Cross-Complainant); As to: Norman Theuerkorn (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Darren Michael Young on 12/05/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Darren Michael Young

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2675610 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2675611 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:2675612 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
212 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Darren Michael Young (Plaintiff); As to: The H. Wood Group (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/09/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Darren Michael Young (Plaintiff); As to: Norman Theuerkorn (Defendant); Blind Dragon (Defendant); The H. Wood Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Darren Michael Young (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7260    Hearing Date: April 21, 2021    Dept: 39

Darren Michael Young v. Norman Theuerkorn, et al.

Case No. *******7260

Motions to Compel Further Responses

Plaintiff Darren Michael Young (“Plaintiff”) filed this action after he was assaulted by Norman Theuerkorn in a nightclub owned and operated by HH Blind Dragon, LLC and Innovative Dining Group LLP (collectively, “Defendants”). Plaintiff now seeks to compel further responses to certain Special Interrogatories, Set Two from Defendants. Plaintiff seeks three categories of information. First, Plaintiff seeks to learn the amount of money earned in total during the relevant time period. Second, Plaintiff seeks to learn the amount of money earned from alcohol sales during the relevant time period. Third, Plaintiff seeks to learn the amount of money earned in total from entry fees during the relevant time period.

As an initial matter, Defendants argue that the Court should deny the motions for failure to schedule an informal discovery conference. These motions were filed before Judge Goorvitch was assigned to Department #39, so the current requirements were not in place at that time. Putting that aside, the Court would excuse the IDC requirement in this case since it is clear that no compromise would be reached given the nature of the dispute.

The Court denies the motions to compel further responses with respect to the first and second categories of information. Although information concerning Norman Theuerkorn’s alcohol consumption may be discoverable, the requested information is too remote and speculative to reach this issue. Simply, the amount of money earned in total, and the amount of money earned from alcohol sales, do not reach this dispositive issue. Based upon the foregoing, the Court denies the motions as they relate Requests for Production #57 to #64.

The Court grants the motions as they relate to information concerning the amount of entry fees earned during the relevant time period. The number of people in the nightclub may be relevant to whether Defendants were negligent, i.e., whether they had sufficient staff on hand to address issues like the one raised in the complaint. Presumably, Plaintiff knows the amount of the entry fee since he paid it himself, allowing him to determine the number of people who entered the nightclub based upon the total entry fees during the relevant time period. Based upon the foregoing, the Court grants the motions as they relate to Requests for Production #65 to #68. However, if Defendants do not keep records of their entry fees based upon the dates and/or times referenced in Plaintiff’s requests (e.g., between 8 p.m. and 12 a.m. and between 12 a.m. and 2 a.m.), they may not be able to respond to these Special Interrogatories.

The Court declines to award sanctions to either side, as an award to either side would be unjust. Defendants shall provide verified responses, to the extent possible, without objections to Request for Production #65 to #68 within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Plaintiff’s counsel shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE H. WOOD GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where WILSHIRE CRESCENT HEIGHTS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA VISION ON WILSHIRE is a litigant

Latest cases where INNOVATIVE DINING GROUP LLC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARRIS KHAIL A.