This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 00:15:53 (UTC).

DARREN HILL, ET AL. VS URBAN COMMONS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 DARREN HILL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against URBAN COMMONS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6391

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OPOLINSKY LEE

MAREK EDWARD

DERAGISCH I LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOKOLOSKY BRANDON

QUINN CRAIG

POYER MICHAEL

HOCHSTADT SCOTT

MCBRIDE WILLIAM

JUST JILL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KRAAKE BRIAN

HILL DARREN

Defendants

WU HOWARD

WOODS TAYLOR

EAGLE NASHVILLE AIRPORT HOTEL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARTIN GREGG ADAM

MARTIN GREGG A.

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DFEAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM O

1/24/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DFEAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM O

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION...)

1/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION...) OF 01/26/2022

1/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION...) OF 01/26/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE OF URBAN COMMONS, LLC; ORDER ...)

12/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE OF URBAN COMMONS, LLC; ORDER ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE OF URBAN COMMONS, LLC; ORDER ...) OF 12/14/2021

12/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE OF URBAN COMMONS, LLC; ORDER ...) OF 12/14/2021

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/30/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/7/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

8/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

6/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/23/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/24/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: why Defendants Urban Commons, Wu, and Woods should not be dismissed following resolution of their bankruptcy cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: why the stay against Defendant Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC should not be lifted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the case should not be dismissed for failure to seek entry of default/default judgment) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DFEAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION...) of 01/26/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR STAY OF THE ENTIRE ACTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DFEAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GREGG A. MARTIN, ESQ.); Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: (service of Urban Commons, LLC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of Default/Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: service of Urban Commons, LLC; Order ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence (Affidavit of Due Diligence); Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DARREN HILL (Plaintiff); EDWARD MAREK (Plaintiff); WILLIAM MCBRIDE (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6391 Hearing Date: January 26, 2022 Dept: 39

Darren Hill, et al. v. Urban Commons LLC, Case No. *******6391

Plaintiffs filed this action against Defendants Urban Commons LLC, Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC, Taylor Woods, and Howard Wu. Now, Plaintiffs seek a stay of this action because Defendants Urban Commons and Wu have declared bankruptcy, and Plaintiffs believe that Defendant Woods may declare bankruptcy, too. Based upon the foregoing, the Court stays this entire action pending resolution of the bankruptcy actions. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause why Defendants Urban Commons, Wu, and Woods should not be dismissed following resolution of their bankruptcy cases. This hearing shall be held on June 27, 2022, at 8:30 a.m. at the following location:

Stanley Mosk Courthouse

111 North Hill Street

Department #39 (Goorvitch, J.)

Los Angeles, California 90012

The Court also sets an Order to Show Cause why the stay against Defendant Eagle Nashville Airport Hotel, LLC should not be lifted for the same date/time/location. Plaintiffs’ counsel shall file a status report on or before June 20, 2022, concerning these issues. If Plaintiffs’ counsel does not appear at the hearing absent good cause, the Court intends to dismiss Defendants Urban Commons, Wu and Woods, and will set an Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal with respect to the remaining defendant(s). The Court’s clerk shall serve this order upon Plaintiffs’ counsel. Further notice is not required.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN GREGG ADAM