This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 03:08:29 (UTC).

DARRELL PETERSEN ET AL VS HERMINIO MERINO FLORES ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 DARRELL PETERSEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERMINIO MERINO FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1444

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PETERSEN DENISE

PETERSEN DARRELL

Respondents and Defendants

LARA LOPEZ SANTIAGO

MERINO-FLORES HERMINIO

DOES 1 TO 25

Minors

PETERSEN JILLIAN

PETERSEN MEGAN

Guardian Ad Litem

PETERSEN HEATHER AND INDIVIDUALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WESTPHAL WESLEY B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - MOTOR VEHICLE - PROPERTY DAMAGE I- PERSONAL INJURY

10/27/2017: COMPLAINT?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - MOTOR VEHICLE - PROPERTY DAMAGE I- PERSONAL INJURY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD SANDOVAL

12/11/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD SANDOVAL

SUMMONS

12/1/2017: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVL

11/17/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVL

11/17/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

12/13/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

Minute Order

4/12/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF RICHARD SANDOVAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DARRELL PETERSEN (Plaintiff); DENISE PETERSEN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - MOTOR VEHICLE - PROPERTY DAMAGE I- PERSONAL INJURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1444    Hearing Date: January 02, 2020    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISES

Claimant Jillian Petersen (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Heather Petersen (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims with Petitioner’s uninsured motorist carrier, Liberty Mutual, in exchange for $13,000.00. If approved, $2,781.00 will be used for medical expenses, $3,225.34 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $98.64 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $6,895.02 for Claimant to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

In addition, Claimant Megan Petersen (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Heather Petersen (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims Petitioner’s uninsured motorist carrier, Liberty Mutual, in exchange for $13,000.00. If approved, $3,150.00 will be used for medical expenses, $3,225.47 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $98.11 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $6,526.42 for Claimant to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code ;; 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. ; 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlements and finds that they are fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlements, are fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petitions to approve minor’s compromise are GRANTED.

The Court sets an OSC for March 2, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B for proof of deposit in the blocked accounts. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 7.953(a).) If an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimants must appear at the January 2, 2020 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimants’ appearances are not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTPHAL WESLEY