This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2020 at 01:30:32 (UTC).

DARRELL MEYERHOFF ET AL VS ARNOLDO GUTIERREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 DARRELL MEYERHOFF filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARNOLDO GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4655

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

NAUD AMANDA

MEYERHOFF DARRELL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

GUTIERREZ ARNOLDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YEGHOYAN HAYK ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

TOROSYAN ANDREA ESQ.

REPCHIAN DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/16/2020

7/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 07/16/2020

Request for Dismissal

7/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE FINA...)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE FINA...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE AND TRIAL DATE

2/4/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE AND TRIAL DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

12/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...) OF 12/30/2019

12/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...) OF 12/30/2019

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/9/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/9/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/9/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/9/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/9/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Answer

2/8/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/13/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/9/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION OF ATTORNEY HAYK YEGHOYAN TO BE RELIEVED AS...)

5/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION OF ATTORNEY HAYK YEGHOYAN TO BE RELIEVED AS...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/28/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

5/29/2019: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Complaint -

2/15/2018: Complaint -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • Hearing03/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Darrell Meyerhoff (Plaintiff); Amanda Naud (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 07/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Hayk Yeghoyan, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion of Attorney Hayk Yeghoyan to be Relieved as...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Darrell Meyerhoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel (for Plaintiffs, Darrell Meyerhoff and Amanda Naud); Filed by Hayk Yeghoyan, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Hayk Yeghoyan, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Arnoldo Gutierrez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Darrell Meyerhoff (Plaintiff); Amanda Naud (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694655    Hearing Date: December 30, 2019    Dept: 2

Meyerhoff et al v. Gutierrez, et al.

Six Motions by Defendant Arnoldo Gutierrez to Compel Plaintiffs Darrell Meyerhoff and Amanda Naud to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One; Special Interrogatories, Set One, and Request for Production of Documents. Set One; Request for Sanctions; are GRANTED.

Plaintiffs Darrell Meyerhoff and Amanda Naud are ordered to provide verified responses without objection to the foregoing discovery within 20 days. Cal Code Civ Procedure §2030.290(b); 2031.300(b).

Defendant served written discovery on Plaintiffs on 2/7/18. Motions, Ex. A. Plaintiffs did not respond. Declaration of Daniel Repchian at ¶2. Defense counsel subsequently granted a number of extensions for Plaintiffs to respond. Id. at ¶¶ 3 and 4. Plaintiffs’ counsel subsequently withdrew as counsel of record. Motions, Ex. B.

Defense counsel has left voice mails and mailed a meet and confer letter to Plaintiffs on 9/27/19. Declaration of Daniel Repchian at ¶ 6-8, Ex. C. Plaintiffs have never responded. Id. at ¶ 10.

The court imposes total sanctions of $1,569.90 for all six motions against Plaintiffs Darrell Meyerhoff and Amanda Naud for the failure to timely respond to authorized methods of discovery, which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 2023.010(d).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.