Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 04:30:32 (UTC).

DARLENE KAY FUNK, ET AL. VS KANG FAN YIK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 DARLENE KAY FUNK filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KANG FAN YIK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6381

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FUNK LEONARD

FUNK DARLENE KAY

Defendants

YIK JESSICA

YIK KANG FAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

OGRIN DEAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/8/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2024
  • Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Hearing08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DARLENE KAY FUNK (Plaintiff); LEONARD FUNK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DARLENE KAY FUNK (Plaintiff); LEONARD FUNK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DARLENE KAY FUNK (Plaintiff); LEONARD FUNK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGRIN DEAN