This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2019 at 05:29:18 (UTC).

DARIO RAMOS ET AL VS STEELE WATER CABLE INC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 a Labor - Other Labor case was filed by DARIO RAMOS against STEELE WATER CABLE INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4818

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

ELIHU M. BERLE

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RODRIGUEZ WILSON

RAMOS DARIO

Defendants and Respondents

STEELE WATER CABLE INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FOROUZAN LAW

HARRIS ALAN

LAW FOROUZAN

HARRIS DALE ALAN

FOROUZAN DANIEL

GARRETT DAVID COVINGTON

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FISHER & PHILLIPS LLP

SORSHER BORIS

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILSON RODRIGUEZ

10/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILSON RODRIGUEZ

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN HARRIS

10/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN HARRIS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DARIO RAMOS

10/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DARIO RAMOS

Motion for Attorney Fees

10/25/2019: Motion for Attorney Fees

Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

7/3/2019: Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/14/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN HARRIS IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

5/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN HARRIS IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN HARRIS IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

3/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ALAN HARRIS IN SUPPORT OF UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/14/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Stipulation - No Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO STA PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION; ORDER

9/18/2018: Stipulation - No Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO STA PROCEEDINGS PENDING MEDIATION; ORDER

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/29/2018: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Postponement - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/5/2018: Notice of Postponement - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order -

5/15/2018: Minute Order -

Other - - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM-CLASS ACTIONS)

5/15/2018: Other - - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM-CLASS ACTIONS)

Other - - PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE; DECLARATION OF LAUREN STOCKUNAS

4/23/2018: Other - - PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE; DECLARATION OF LAUREN STOCKUNAS

Notice - -NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION

3/29/2018: Notice - -NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - -

4/9/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint - -

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • Hearing12/04/2019 at 10:30 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Hearing12/04/2019 at 10:30 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Alan Harris)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Dario Ramos)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Stephanie Molina of ILYM Group, Inc.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Wilson Rodriguez)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Dario Ramos)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMotion for Final Approval of Settlement; Filed by Dario Ramos (Plaintiff); Wilson Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Alan Harris)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Filed by Dario Ramos (Plaintiff); Wilson Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Dario Ramos (Plaintiff); Wilson Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketNotice -NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketMinute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketOrder -CLASS ACTION INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dario Ramos (Plaintiff); Wilson Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT 1.FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694818    Hearing Date: December 04, 2019    Dept: 1

TENTATIVE RULING

GRANT final approval and award/approve as follows:

(1) $56,661 for attorney fees to Class Counsel, Harris & Ruble (60%) and Forouzan Law (40%); (2) $8,193.04 for attorney costs to Class Counsel; (3) $10,000 for enhancement awards to the class representatives [$5k x 2]; (4) $8,700 for claims administration costs to ILYM Group, Inc.; and (5) $3,750 [75% of $5,000 PAGA penalty] to the LWDA.