This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2021 at 04:20:14 (UTC).

DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZ, ET AL. VS ON CALL LEGAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ON CALL LEGAL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1773

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODRIGUEZ DANYA MELISSA

MARISCAL AMBER

Defendants

SOLEYMANI SHANA

ON CALL LEGAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARLIS BRENT PHILIP

Defendant Attorney

KASHFIAN ROBERT ADAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; OSC RE MEDIATION))

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; OSC RE MEDIATION))

Case Management Statement

8/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

7/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; OSC RE DISMISSAL OF UNNAMED D...)

4/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; OSC RE DISMISSAL OF UNNAMED D...)

Response - RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL AGAINST DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANTS COUNSEL OF RECORD OFF CALENDAR

3/10/2021: Response - RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL AGAINST DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANTS COUNSEL OF RECORD OFF CALENDAR

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO DECLARATIONS OF YOUNG K. PARK IN SUPPORT FOR ORDERS COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

3/2/2021: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO DECLARATIONS OF YOUNG K. PARK IN SUPPORT FOR ORDERS COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DANYA MELISSA RODRIGUEZS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

3/2/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMBER MARISCALS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ON CALL LEGAL, INC. TO PROVIDE ALL SIX SETS OF FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AND COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $

3/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ON CALL LEGAL, INC. TO PROVIDE ALL SIX SETS OF FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AND COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

2/17/2021: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ON CALL LEGAL, INC TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORY EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

2/17/2021: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ON CALL LEGAL, INC TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FORM INTERROGATORY EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • Hearing04/15/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose; OSC Re Mediation)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; OSC Re Mediation))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Danya Melissa Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Amber Mariscal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose; OSC Re Dismissal of Unnamed Does and Unserved Defendants)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Status Conference (All-Purpose; OSC Re Dismissal of Unnamed D...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by On Call Legal, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Shana Soleymani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Danya Melissa Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Amber Mariscal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danya Melissa Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Amber Mariscal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danya Melissa Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Amber Mariscal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Danya Melissa Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Amber Mariscal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Danya Melissa Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Amber Mariscal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ON CALL LEGAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASHFIAN ROBERT A. ESQ.