Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 02:38:19 (UTC).

DANNY SHAN, ET AL. VS THE REINALT-THOMAS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 DANNY SHAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE REINALT-THOMAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1102

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAN DANNY

Defendants

THE REINALT-THOMAS CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DISCOUNT TIRE CO. INC.

DISCOUNT TIRE CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN TODD MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

4/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 04/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

4/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 04/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

4/5/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • Hearing05/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:45 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 04/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danny Shan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Danny Shan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOUNT TIRE CO. OF UTAH INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN TODD M.