This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 06:17:51 (UTC).

DANNY MORENO VS REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 DANNY MORENO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING, L L C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0594

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO DANNY

Defendant

REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREIMAN LAWRENCE W.

Defendant Attorney

WIENS KIERSTEN ASHLEY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/6/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

2/14/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Order - COURT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

6/8/2022: Order - COURT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

12/5/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2024
  • Hearing03/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2024
  • Hearing03/01/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - Partial: Name Extension: - Partial ; As To Parties changed from Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling, L.L.C. (Defendant) to Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal - Partial: As To Parties changed from Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling, L.L.C. (Defendant) to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Does 1 through 20, Inclusive scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Danny Moreno on 01/06/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Danny Moreno, does 1 through 20, inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Danny Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/01/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketJury Trial , T/E: 7 days, scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Does 1 through 20, Inclusive scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Danny Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling, L.L.C. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/12/2022; Service Cost: 111.85; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Danny Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Danny Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Danny Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Reyes Coca-Cola Bottling, L.L.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less