This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2020 at 07:52:48 (UTC).

DANNY MOLANO VS PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 05/14/2018 DANNY MOLANO filed an Other lawsuit against PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS, JON R. TAKASUGI, STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6048

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MOLANO DANNY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER

SHAPIRO MICHAEL M.D.

AHLUWALIA RAJ M.D.

SONGSTAD AMANDA

VOORHEES MATTHEW

AZUSA PACIFIC UNIVERSITY DOE 5

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER DBA PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEIDCAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ROVEN JONATHAN D. ESQ.

KAHN ROBERT ALLAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HERNANDEZ & PAGLIA LLP

LAMB MICHAEL

PAGLIA ANTOINETTE DANIELLE

STOCKALPER PATRICK EDWARD

KELLY JOHN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020

Motion for Summary Judgment

4/22/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Dismissal

2/13/2020: Request for Dismissal

Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/7/2020: Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

11/8/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MTS HEARING OFF CALENDAR

11/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MTS HEARING OFF CALENDAR

Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION OF DEFENDANT PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER

11/1/2019: Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION OF DEFENDANT PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER

Demand for Jury Trial

8/20/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING FOR THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION AND OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEF DUE DATES

8/15/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING FOR THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION AND OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEF DUE DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHARLES N. MOON

7/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHARLES N. MOON

Answer

6/3/2019: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/18/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - (Cancelled in CRS 1/08/2018)

11/13/2018: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts - (Cancelled in CRS 1/08/2018)

DECLARATION -

6/11/2018: DECLARATION -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/4/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Summons -

5/14/2018: Summons -

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Hearing10/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Hearing10/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Hearing09/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Taking MSJ of Raj S. Ahluwalia, MD Off Calendar); Filed by Raj Ahluwalia, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Danny Molano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORMA DBA PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER TO COMPLAINT FOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Danny Molano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Danny Molano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Danny Molano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Danny Molano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Danny Molano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706048    Hearing Date: December 11, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

DANNY MOLANO,

Plaintiff,

v.

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC706048

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT, JUDGE PFAHLER presiding in DEPT. F49 of the CHATSWORTH Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 15, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court