This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2021 at 06:50:17 (UTC).

DANNY LOPEZ VS WALMART INC.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 DANNY LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0844

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ DANNY

Defendant

WALMART INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BERKOVICH GARY

LEVINE MARC ERIC

Defendant Attorney

COLBERT MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/30/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Association of Attorney

2/8/2021: Association of Attorney

Demand for Jury Trial

2/3/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

2/3/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/18/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

7/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Danny Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Marc Eric Levine (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Danny Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Walmart Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Walmart Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Danny Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Danny Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danny Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE MARC ERIC