This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2023 at 10:42:57 (UTC).

DANNY LEOS (DECEASED) BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST YVONNE LEOS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS BERTHA MOLINARI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 DANNY LEOS DECEASED BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST YVONNE LEOS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BERTHA MOLINARI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1061

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANNY LEOS DECEASED BY AND THROUGH HIS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST YVONNE LEOS AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF MONETEBELLO

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS A PUBLIC ENTITY

MOLINARI BERTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAYNGOR JEFFREY

Defendant Attorneys

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY SUZANNE

ORDAZ SERGIO

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/14/2023: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

3/13/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/13/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

2/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

2/24/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/24/2023: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service - No Service

1/27/2023: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

12/30/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

12/30/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2024
  • Hearing12/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2024
  • Hearing06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2024
  • Hearing06/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketSummons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Bertha Molinari (Cross-Complainant); As to: City of Monetebello (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Bertha Molinari (Defendant); As to: Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Bertha Molinari (Defendant); As to: City of Monetebello (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Bertha Molinari (Defendant); Service Date: 02/11/2023; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual on 12/30/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual as to County of Los Angeles, a public entity

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual (Plaintiff); County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant); As to: County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: City of Monetebello (Defendant); As to: Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Bertha Molinari (Defendant); County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant); Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, a public entity (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Bertha Molinari (Defendant); County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant); Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, a public entity (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Danny Leos (Deceased) By and Through his Successor in Interest Yvonne Leos, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Bertha Molinari (Defendant); County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Defendant); Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, a public entity (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less