This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 05:58:20 (UTC).

DANNY JACOBO, ET AL. VS SANTIAGO MEJIA ROSALES

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 DANNY JACOBO filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANTIAGO MEJIA ROSALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7670

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACOBO DANNY

JACOBO LIZET

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ROSALES SANTIAGO MEJIA

Cross Defendant

MOES 1 - 500

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAOLI WILLIAM M.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KRAMER JEFFREY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • Hearing07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Santiago Mejia Rosales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Santiago Mejia Rosales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danny Jacobo (Plaintiff); Lizet Jacobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danny Jacobo (Plaintiff); Lizet Jacobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Danny Jacobo (Plaintiff); Lizet Jacobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Danny Jacobo (Plaintiff); Lizet Jacobo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAMER JEFFREY