This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 02:16:59 (UTC).

DANNY GILBERT APODACA VS MANUEL TIMOTHY GERARD ENRIQUEZ

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 DANNY GILBERT APODACA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MANUEL TIMOTHY GERARD ENRIQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7901

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APODACA DANNY GILBERT

Defendant

ENRIQUEZ MANUEL TIMOTHY GERARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZAVIDOW ROBERT M.

BISH MINDY SUSAN

Defendant Attorney

GALANG BRITTON P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

6/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

7/8/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/8/2021: Answer

Association of Attorney

7/2/2021: Association of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/25/2021

8/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/25/2021

Notice of Settlement

8/25/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

9/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Danny Gilbert Apodaca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/25/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Danny Gilbert Apodaca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Manuel Timothy Gerard Enriquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Manuel Timothy Gerard Enriquez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Danny Gilbert Apodaca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Danny Gilbert Apodaca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danny Gilbert Apodaca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Danny Gilbert Apodaca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Danny Gilbert Apodaca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALANG BRITTON P. ESQ.