Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 07:30:41 (UTC).

DANIELS, IVORY TYREE - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 DANIELS, IVORY TYREE - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NORD, SCOTT J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0098

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NORD, SCOTT J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DANIELS ROBIN

Not Classified By Court

DANIELS IVORY TYREE

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

PROBATE INVESTIGATORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

MURPHY PAT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/8/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

7/8/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel

7/6/2021: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - Report Court Appointed Counsel

Proof - Mailing - Court Investigation Report

6/4/2021: Proof - Mailing - Court Investigation Report

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

5/27/2021: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Notice - Hearing

5/27/2021: Notice - Hearing

Notice - of Rejection

5/10/2021: Notice - of Rejection

Order - Appointing Counsel

4/13/2021: Order - Appointing Counsel

Citation

3/29/2021: Citation

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

3/29/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial)

3/29/2021: Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • Hearing08/05/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department A12 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Appointment Hearing - Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketReport - Court Appointed Counsel (Report Court Appointed Counsel ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketReport - Regional Center (Report - Regional Center ); Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketReport - Court Investigator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketProof - Mailing (Court Investigation Report ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketMedical Supplemental Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel; Filed by Appointed Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCitation; Filed by Subject

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBATE INVESTIGATORS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY PAT