This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2022 at 10:57:31 (UTC).

DANIELLE WHITE, AN INDIVIDUAL VS DUSTIN HORTON, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 DANIELLE WHITE, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DUSTIN HORTON, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3899

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE AN INDIVIDUAL DANIELLE

Defendants

EAN HOLDINGS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR OF LOS ANGELES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HORTON AN INDIVIDUAL DUSTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAZZA STEVEN L.

Defendant Attorney

BOYD KURT UNLAND

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

7/25/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

7/25/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

7/25/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Complaint

7/25/2022: Complaint

Answer

8/30/2022: Answer

Answer

8/30/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2024
  • Hearing07/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2024
  • Hearing01/08/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by EAN HOLDINGS, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR OF LOS ANGELES, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DANIELLE WHITE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DANIELLE WHITE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DANIELLE WHITE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DANIELLE WHITE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DANIELLE WHITE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by DANIELLE WHITE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DANIELLE WHITE, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.