Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 08:43:38 (UTC).

DANIELLE WEBB VS SHANNON'S ON PINE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 DANIELLE WEBB filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SHANNON'S ON PINE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8192

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WEBB DANIELLE

Defendants and Respondents

SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE INC

SHANNON'S ON PINE INC

DOES 1 TO 10

RILEY HODGES

HODGES RILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JAVANMARDI PETER A.

JAVANMARDI PEDRAM AMIR ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BERNADETTE M. O'BRIEN ESQ.

PARKER ALDEN JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTIONS (6) TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

3/2/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTIONS (6) TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/2/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DECLARATION OF DAVID V. HARRIS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

5/24/2018: DECLARATION OF DAVID V. HARRIS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/9/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

2/2/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC.

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC.

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1345 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ON PINE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODU

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1345 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ON PINE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODU

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1345 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ON PINE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATOR

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1345 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ON PINE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATOR

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1345 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGA

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1345 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGA

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1345 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGA

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO C.R.C. RULE 3.1345 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGA

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORTES - GENERAL, SET ONE NOS. 12.1, 12.2, 12.6 AND 15.1 AND REQUEST FOR MON

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORTES - GENERAL, SET ONE NOS. 12.1, 12.2, 12.6 AND 15.1 AND REQUEST FOR MON

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT, SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ETC

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ON PINE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET ONE ETC

1/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SHANNON'S ON PINE, INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET ONE ETC

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

1/24/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERLFIED COMPLAINT

9/22/2017: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERLFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

7/17/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Danielle Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 12; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Shannon's on Pine Inc (Defendant); Shannon's Rotisserie Inc (Defendant); Riley Hodges (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Shannon's on Pine Inc (Defendant); Shannon's Rotisserie Inc (Defendant); Riley Hodges (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 12; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Danielle Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF FEHA (GOV. CODE 12940(A)); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Danielle Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHANNON'S ROTISSERIE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHANNON'S ON PINE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAVANMARDI PETER A.