Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 02:31:18 (UTC).

DANIELLE THERESA GONZALES, AN INDIVIDUAL VS PARK SANG WOO, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 DANIELLE THERESA GONZALES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PARK SANG WOO, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8786

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALES AN INDIVIDUAL DANIELLE THERESA

Defendants

WOO AN INDIVIDUAL PARK SANG

RASIER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PARK AN INDIVIDUAL NAMKYU

RASIER-CA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A CORPORATION

UBER USA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALLACE BRADLEY S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/4/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Complaint

5/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DANIELLE THERESA GONZALES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DANIELLE THERESA GONZALES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DANIELLE THERESA GONZALES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DANIELLE THERESA GONZALES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant