This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 04:11:18 (UTC).

DANIELLE LA TRECE ELLIS VS ALAN RAMON ALVARADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 DANIELLE LA TRECE ELLIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALAN RAMON ALVARADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8771

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELLIS DANIELLE LA TRECE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC.

S.P.F. LOGISTICS INC.

ALVARADO ALAN RAMON

Cross Defendant and Defendant

S.P.F. LOGISTICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECK MITCHELL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SWEENEY ANNA C.

MANASANTIVONGS ALISA

FIELDS GARY DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

9/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

5/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/18/2021

8/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/18/2021

Substitution of Attorney

7/23/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Dismissal

7/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

5/15/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/15/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

4/3/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/6/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/6/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

4/6/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/17/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Danielle LA Trece Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 08/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered); Filed by Danielle LA Trece Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Danielle LA Trece Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Alan Ramon Alvarado (Defendant); S.P.F. Logistics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alan Ramon Alvarado (Defendant); S.P.F. Logistics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Danielle LA Trece Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Danielle LA Trece Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Danielle LA Trece Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Danielle LA Trece Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danielle LA Trece Ellis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.P.F. LOGISTICS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLEXI-VAN LEASING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK MITCHELL