This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2020 at 10:04:49 (UTC).

DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN VS. CONGREGATE LIVING HEALTH

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONGREGATE LIVING HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8818

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

ALLEN DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO

CASTILLO CLEONA

ALI ALLEN SUING BY AND THROUGH HIS GAL DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLOALLEN ASHTON DANIEL

TRINITEE ALLEN SUING BY AND THROUGH HER GAL DENIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN AALIYAH DANIELLE

ALLEN SUING BY AND THROUGH HIS GAL DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN AHMAD D'QUANN

SCALES SUING BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN AMIYA D.

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

CORBIN CONGREGATE HOME

KAMORNICK ELISHA

CONGREGATE LIVING HEALTH FACILITY

CONGREGATE LIVING HEALTH FACILITY CORPORATION OF UNKNOWN ORIGIN & DBA CORBIN CONGREGATE HOME INC.

Minors

ALLEN AHMAD D'QUANN

SCALES AMIYA D.

ALLEN ASHTON DANIEL ALI

ALLEN AALIYAH DANIELLE TRINITEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTIAN ORONSAYE ESQ.

ORONSAYE CHRISTIAN IGHEGHA

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF CURT SURLS

SURLS CURTIS LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

11/5/2019: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY; 2) ORDER TO SHO...) OF 12/04/2019

12/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY; 2) ORDER TO SHO...) OF 12/04/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

1/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)

Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN IN CONNECTION WITH THE FILING OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/5/2019: Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN IN CONNECTION WITH THE FILING OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint

3/5/2019: Amended Complaint

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

4/2/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/22/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/22/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons

7/16/2018: Summons

Case Management Statement

8/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

8/20/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/6/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Opposition - to defendant's demurrer to plaintiff's complaint; memorandum of points and authorities

10/5/2018: Opposition - to defendant's demurrer to plaintiff's complaint; memorandum of points and authorities

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/20/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike -

9/5/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike -

Proof of Personal Service -

8/20/2018: Proof of Personal Service -

Case Management Statement -

8/20/2018: Case Management Statement -

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Mandatory Settlement Conference) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference (Re Mediation and Discovery) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Mediation and Discovery)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Re Related Case Determination with EC068817 filed 06/22/18 (Dept E-NCG)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Status Conference (Re Mediation and Discovery) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re Mediation and Discovery; 2) Order to Sho...) of 12/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re Mediation and Discovery; 2) Order to Sho...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by CONGREGATE LIVING HEALTH FACILITY, Corporation of Unknown Origin & DBA Corbin Congregate Home, Inc. (Defendant); ELISHA KAMORNICK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees (REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN ); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees (REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CLEONA CASTILLO ); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketApplication - Miscellaneous (APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN AND FORWARDED TO DEPT D ); Filed by Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketApplication - Miscellaneous (APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY CLEONA CASTILLO AND FORWARDED TO DEPT D ); Filed by Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver (ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY DANIELLE CLEONA CASTILLO ALLEN ); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less