This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 07:57:43 (UTC).

DANIELLE ACRIE VS STEALTH AEROSPACE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2018 DANIELLE ACRIE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against STEALTH AEROSPACE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5065

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACRIE DANIELLE

Defendants

GLICKSTEIN ALON

STEALTH AEROSPACE INC.

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY - LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

10/4/2018: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY - LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INTENT TO SEEK ADDITIONAL CLAIMS AT TRIAL DE NOVO

7/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INTENT TO SEEK ADDITIONAL CLAIMS AT TRIAL DE NOVO

Witness List

8/9/2019: Witness List

Exhibit List

8/9/2019: Exhibit List

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

8/27/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Trial Brief

10/8/2019: Trial Brief

Exhibit List

10/8/2019: Exhibit List

Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENTS WITNESS LIST

10/8/2019: Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENTS WITNESS LIST

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RELEASING CASH-DEPOSIT POSTED BY DEFENDANT/APPELLANT PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 98.2(B)

10/15/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RELEASING CASH-DEPOSIT POSTED BY DEFENDANT/APPELLANT PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 98.2(B)

Notice of Settlement

10/16/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/23/2019

1/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/23/2019

Order - Order CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

1/23/2019: Order - Order CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM DECISION OF LABOR COMMISSIONER

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM DECISION OF LABOR COMMISSIONER

Notice - Notice Notice of Representation

1/16/2019: Notice - Notice Notice of Representation

Case Management Statement

1/16/2019: Case Management Statement

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Notice of Settlement (Conditional) Filed October 16, 2019.) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Danielle Acrie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Order Releasing Cash-Deposit Posted By Defendant/Appellant Pursuant to Labor Code section 98.2(b)); Filed by Danielle Acrie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketWitness List (PLAINTIFF/RESPONDENT?S WITNESS LIST); Filed by Danielle Acrie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketTrial Brief; Filed by Danielle Acrie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Danielle Acrie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketOrder (CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/23/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Danielle Acrie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Representation); Filed by Danielle Acrie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Stealth Aerospace, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Stealth Aerospace, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketNotice Of Case Management Conference For Dept 44 Only - Labor Commissioner Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL FROM DECISION OF LABOR COMMISSIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Appeal; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant