This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 04:53:10 (UTC).

DANIELA PEREZ VS EAST TERRACE REHABILITATION & WELLNESS CENTRE, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 DANIELA PEREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EAST TERRACE REHABILITATION WELLNESS CENTRE, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3682

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ DANIELA

Defendants

EAST TERRACE REHABILITATION & WELLNESS CENTRE LP

EAST TERRACE WELLNESS GP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOURMAND MICHAEL

BARTH MICHAEL SCOTT

DE SARIO JAMES A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/28/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/28/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/28/2022: Complaint

Order - ORDER INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/10/2022: Order - ORDER INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/10/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 03/10/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

5/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

5/3/2022: Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/20/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/20/2022: Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Docketat 10:49 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Daniela Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Daniela Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Daniela Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Daniela Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketOrder (Initial Status Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Setting Initial Status Conference) of 03/10/2022, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Setting Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniela Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniela Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniela Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST TERRACE REHABILITATION & WELLNESS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARTH MICHAEL SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE SARIO JAMES A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOURMAND MICHAEL