This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2023 at 10:45:16 (UTC).

DANIEL ZEWDU, ET AL. VS RINDALA FAHMY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 DANIEL ZEWDU, filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RINDALA FAHMY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0201

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HAILEMICHAEL SURAFEL

ZEWDU DANIEL

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CAPITAL EAGLE SECURITY INC.

FAHMY SAM AKA SAM NAGUIB FAHMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANVLECK BRIAN F.

Defendant Attorney

REYNOLDS JAMES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

4/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

4/20/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE) OF 04/05/2023

4/5/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE) OF 04/05/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

4/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/5/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

3/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...) OF 03/20/2023

3/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...) OF 03/20/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)

3/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)

Order - ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3/10/2023: Order - ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

3/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Substitution of Attorney

2/28/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/28/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

2/21/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

2/16/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

2/16/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/16/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

2/16/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Separate Statement

12/16/2022: Separate Statement

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2023
  • Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application Continue Trial Date scheduled for 04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to 04/24/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application Continue Trial Date: Filed By: Daniel Zewdu (Plaintiff),Surafel Hailemichael (Plaintiff),Capital Eagle Security, Inc. (Defendant),Sam Fahmy (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/24/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Capital Eagle Security, Inc. (Defendant), Daniel Zewdu (Plaintiff), Surafel Hailemichael (Plaintiff), Sam Fahmy (Defendant) to Sam Fahmy (Defendant), Daniel Zewdu (Plaintiff), Capital Eagle Security, Inc. (Defendant), Surafel Hailemichael (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Continue Trial Date)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketEx Parte Application Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Daniel Zewdu (Plaintiff); Surafel Hailemichael (Plaintiff); Capital Eagle Security, Inc. (Defendant); Sam Fahmy (Defendant); As to: Daniel Zewdu (Plaintiff); Surafel Hailemichael (Plaintiff); Capital Eagle Security, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/01/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/01/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Daniel Zewdu (Plaintiff); Surafel Hailemichael (Plaintiff); As to: Capital Eagle Security, Inc. (Defendant); Rindala Fahmy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Daniel Zewdu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Daniel Zewdu (Plaintiff); Surafel Hailemichael (Plaintiff); As to: Capital Eagle Security, Inc. (Defendant); Rindala Fahmy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara A. Meiers in Department 12 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less