This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 01:53:28 (UTC).

DANIEL TONTINI VS JOSEPH M BARRETT ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/07/2017 DANIEL TONTINI filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against JOSEPH M BARRETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2657

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TONTINI DANIEL

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BARRETT JOSEPH M.

LAYFIELD PHILIP J

DOES 1 TO 20

BLAIN DAVID

WAKEFIELD TODD D.

WALLACE BRADLEY S.

CROWE WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PARKER DAVID B. ESQ.

WANG STEVEN SEAWHAN ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MONDIA MARIE B.

HARVEY RICHARD ALLEN

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GRIVAKES CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Objection

6/17/2019: Objection

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/17/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

7/1/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

7/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/27/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

CROSS-COMPLAINANT DAVID BLAIN?S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY

3/6/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINANT DAVID BLAIN?S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JOSEPH M. BARRETT

3/16/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JOSEPH M. BARRETT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT JOSEPH M. BARRETT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY OF WILLIAM CROWE

4/27/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT JOSEPH M. BARRETT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY OF WILLIAM CROWE

AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (1) PRESENT ACTION, (2) CASE NO. BC670545, AND (3) CASE NO. BC692766

5/7/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (1) PRESENT ACTION, (2) CASE NO. BC670545, AND (3) CASE NO. BC692766

NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/16/2018: [TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF DANIEL TONTINI'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

5/17/2018: PLAINTIFF DANIEL TONTINI'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

6/25/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/31/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/20/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

5/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; (2) LEGAL MALPRACTICE

1/3/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; (2) LEGAL MALPRACTICE

SUMMONS

11/7/2017: SUMMONS

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( for an Order to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by DANIEL TONTINI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (for trial continuance)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by WILLIAM CROWE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (William Crowe) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (David Blain) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Order (re motions for summary judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment Wil...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
187 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; (2) LEGAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Summons; Filed by DANIEL TONTINI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by DANIEL TONTINI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by DANIEL TONTINI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • COMPLAWT FOR (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; (2) LEGAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC682657    Hearing Date: January 16, 2020    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

daniel tontini,

Plaintiff,

vs.

joseph m. barrett, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 682657

Hearing Date:

January 16, 2020

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BY DEFENDANT PHILIP LAYFIELD

Pursuant to CCP §§ 430.41, 435.5 and 439, before filing a demurrer, motion to strike or motion for judgment on the pleadings, the moving party must meet and confer in person or by telephone with the party who filed the pleading that is subject to the demurrer or motion to try to reach an agreement that resolves the claims to be raised in the demurrer or motion. Additionally, the moving party must file a declaration stating either (a) the means by which the moving party met and conferred and that the parties did not reach an agreement, or (b) the other party failed to respond to the request to meet and confer in person or by telephone or otherwise failed to meet and confer in good faith.

The motion for judgment on the pleadings by Defendant Philip Layfield (“Layfield”) does not comply with the above requirements. Accordingly, the Court orders Layfield to immediately comply with the meet and confer requirements. The hearing on the motion for judgment on the pleadings is continued to: _____________, at 8:30 a.m., in Department 50.

If the claims raised in the motion are not resolved and the motion is not withdrawn, Layfield is further ordered to file the requisite declaration at least 5 court days before the date of the continued hearing.

Layfield is ordered to provide notice of this Order.

DATED: January 16, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court