This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2021 at 01:52:04 (UTC).

DANIEL TAYLOR ET AL VS AMAZON.COM INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/07/2018 DANIEL TAYLOR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMAZON COM INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3142

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TAYLOR CORINNE

TAYLOR DANIEL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SHENZHEN MXJO TECHNOLOGY CO. LIMITED

PAGDILAO MELVIN

LOVE 2 VAPE LLC

EDISONBRIGHT INC.

AMAZON.COM INC.

SYSMAX INDUSTRY CO. LIMITED

VERAYO PATRICK

SHENZHEN JETBEAM ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY CO.

GENERATION G INC.

ULTRA HYBRID INC.

NEW ERA WHOLESALE INC.

E-NVEST INC. DBA LA VAPORZ WHOLESALE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TAYLOR DANIEL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

EDISONBRIGHT INC.

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JARCHI ROBERT D.

NICKERSON CHRISTIAN T F

Defendant Attorneys

HUSSEY JULIE LEMAYE

ORTIZ MICHAEL A.

O'SHEA LAURENT G. III

Cross Defendant Attorney

NIEMANN ROBERT STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/11/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE SETTLEMENT ((SELF REPRESENTED PART...) OF 12/03/2020

12/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE SETTLEMENT ((SELF REPRESENTED PART...) OF 12/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE SETTLEMENT ((SELF REPRESENTED PART...)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE SETTLEMENT ((SELF REPRESENTED PART...)

Notice of Ruling

12/14/2020: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

11/12/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/12/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC RE SETTLEMENT

10/19/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC RE SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE SETTLEMENT)

10/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE SETTLEMENT)

Request for Dismissal

9/18/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

9/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/2/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: POST- MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

8/12/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: POST- MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAX L. ROTHMAN ISO AMAZON.COM, INC.S REPLY ISO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/10/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAX L. ROTHMAN ISO AMAZON.COM, INC.S REPLY ISO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Reply - REPLY AMAZON REPLY ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

7/10/2020: Reply - REPLY AMAZON REPLY ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/10/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/14/2020

7/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/14/2020

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((3/11 Per Pltf Case Settled)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Corinne Taylor (Plaintiff); Daniel Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Corinne Taylor (Plaintiff); Daniel Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Edisonbright Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Corinne Taylor (Plaintiff); Daniel Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Settlement ((Self Represented Parties))) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Settlement ((Self Represented Part...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: re Settlement ((Self Represented Part...) of 12/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (((Self Represented Parties))) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Corinne Taylor (Plaintiff); Daniel Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT, AMAZON.COM, INC.'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' DANIEL AND CORINNE TAYLOR'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Corinne Taylor (Plaintiff); Daniel Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIFD WARRANTIES ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Corinne Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less