This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2021 at 21:57:59 (UTC).

DANIEL T BROSCH, ET AL. VS TIMOTHY GOMEZ, JR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 DANIEL T BROSCH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TIMOTHY GOMEZ, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3059

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROSCH DANIEL T

BROSCH SONDRA STEFFAN

Defendants

SCHNEIDER JULIA A

GOMEZ TIMOTHY JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING SHERI

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/31/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/21/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel T Brosch (Plaintiff); Sondra Steffan Brosch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel T Brosch (Plaintiff); Sondra Steffan Brosch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniel T Brosch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANNING SHERI