This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 08:47:17 (UTC).

DANIEL RUAN, ET AL. VS ENTERPRISE TRUCK RENTAL, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 DANIEL RUAN, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ENTERPRISE TRUCK RENTAL, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8961

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CABRERA LILIANA

RUAN DANIEL

Defendants

DEEGAN EXPRESS

ENTERPRISE TRUCK RENTAL LLC

JENALISA FERNANDEZ DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN DIANA

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

Defendant Attorney

ROMAN REECE A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/6/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/6/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/6/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

11/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/5/2022: Answer

Answer

12/13/2022: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/29/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

1/30/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2024
  • Hearing09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2024
  • Hearing03/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jenalisa Fernandez (DOE 1) (Defendant); As to: Daniel Ruan (Plaintiff); Liliana Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Daniel Ruan (Plaintiff); Liliana Cabrera (Plaintiff); As to: Jenalisa Fernandez (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Enterprise Truck Rental, LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant); As to: Daniel Ruan (Plaintiff); Liliana Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Enterprise Truck Rental, LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant); As to: Daniel Ruan (Plaintiff); Liliana Cabrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Daniel Ruan (Plaintiff); Liliana Cabrera (Plaintiff); As to: Deegan Express (Defendant); Service Date: 11/08/2022; Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Daniel Ruan (Plaintiff); Liliana Cabrera (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Truck Rental, LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Daniel Ruan (Plaintiff); Liliana Cabrera (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Truck Rental, LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Daniel Ruan (Plaintiff); Liliana Cabrera (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Truck Rental, LLC (Defendant); Deegan Express (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less