This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 09:00:01 (UTC).

DANIEL REYES SALMERON VS LANYA JANAE RICHMOND, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 DANIEL REYES SALMERON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LANYA JANAE RICHMOND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2366

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALMERON DANIEL REYES

Defendants

RICHMOND LANYA JANAE

SPS VENTURES INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN IVET

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMSON IAN G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

9/29/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

10/25/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/25/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2024
  • Hearing08/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lanya Janae Richmond (Defendant); SPS Ventures Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lanya Janae Richmond (Defendant); SPS Ventures Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Lanya Janae Richmond (Defendant); SPS Ventures Inc., a business entity form unknown (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Daniel Reyes Salmeron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Daniel Reyes Salmeron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Daniel Reyes Salmeron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Reyes Salmeron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Reyes Salmeron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniel Reyes Salmeron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less