This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 05:01:03 (UTC).

DANIEL RAZMJOU VS KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 DANIEL RAZMJOU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2122

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAZMJOU DANIEL

Defendant

MIRZAYAN KRIS KHACHIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEHRABI ARNO

ZOGRABIAN ERIK

Defendant Attorney

ATANOUS CLEIDIN Z.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/18/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/18/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/18/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/18/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

9/22/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

9/22/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

11/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2025
  • Hearing01/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice Of Association of Counsel; Filed by: DANIEL RAZMJOU (Plaintiff); As to: KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN (Defendant); As to: DANIEL RAZMJOU (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DANIEL RAZMJOU (Plaintiff); As to: KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DANIEL RAZMJOU (Plaintiff); As to: KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DANIEL RAZMJOU (Plaintiff); As to: KRIS KHACHIK MIRZAYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOGRABIAN ERIK ESQ.