This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 16:15:37 (UTC).

DANIEL, RAYMOND J - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 DANIEL, RAYMOND J - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NORD, SCOTT J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0070

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NORD, SCOTT J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DANIEL ANTHONY R

Claimant

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC

Decedent

DANIEL RAYMOND J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GROSSMAN LESLIE KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Order - Final Distribution

11/5/2021: Order - Final Distribution

Account - Final or Waiver

5/6/2021: Account - Final or Waiver

Notice - Hearing

5/10/2021: Notice - Hearing

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action

9/15/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action

9/15/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Accounting

9/15/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of Accounting

Supplement - Supplement to Verified Petition

9/15/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Verified Petition

Minute Order

9/23/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/4/2021: Minute Order

Inventory & Appraisal

1/25/2021: Inventory & Appraisal

Creditor's Claim

10/20/2020: Creditor's Claim

Notice

10/23/2020: Notice

Notice - Death

9/1/2020: Notice - Death

Notice

9/1/2020: Notice

Letters (Initial)

8/20/2020: Letters (Initial)

Order - Probate

7/22/2020: Order - Probate

Bond

7/30/2020: Bond

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Accounting ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Verified Petition ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of Notice of Proposed Action ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial/Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department A12, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Not Held - Continued - Court's own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketSupplement; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSMAN LESLIE KENNETH