Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 22:59:43 (UTC).

DANIEL R MCCOMBS VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 DANIEL R MCCOMBS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8853

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCCOMBS DANIEL R.

Defendants and Respondents

ZOUZOUNIS STEVEN E.

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 20

LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSEN STEPHEN N. ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CHARBONEAU ROBERT B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/29/2018: Request for Dismissal

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/22/2017: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

7/20/2017: Unknown

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2017: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Daniel R. McCombs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • CITY OF LOS ANGELES, LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant); Los Angeles World Airports (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel R. McCombs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel R. McCombs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Daniel R. McCombs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Daniel R. McCombs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Daniel R. McCombs (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSEN STEPHEN N.