This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 06:40:59 (UTC).

DANIEL MONROY ET AL VS AGAVNI TISHCHYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 DANIEL MONROY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AGAVNI TISHCHYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2900

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Petitioners, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MONROY DANIEL

SOLA CHRISTOPHER

SAFEWAY INSURANCE COMPANY AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TISHCHYAN AGAVNI

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

MONROY DANIEL

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

RENTAL CAR FINANCE CORP.

MONROY ABRAHAM GALINDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

BORROMEO IRENE GAVIOLA

YEGHOYAN HAYK ESQ.

YEGHOYAN HAYK

SMITH JAY W

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YEGHOYAN HAYK ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WULTERIN SHAYNE L. ESQ.

RONALD ZUREK ESQ.

ZUREK RONALD

ALBARYAN AMALIA

COLE ONICA VALLE

POKLADOWSKI THOMAS D.

BORROMEO IRENE GAVIOLA

Cross Defendant Attorney

GARCIA JEFFREY EMANUEL

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

10/23/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

3/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 10/23/2019

10/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 10/23/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

10/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON COURT ORDER RELATING CASES

11/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING ON COURT ORDER RELATING CASES

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/24/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

2/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

4/25/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Summons - Summons-Cross-Complaint

10/5/2018: Summons - Summons-Cross-Complaint

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AGAVNI TISHCHYAN TO COMPLAINT

6/21/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AGAVNI TISHCHYAN TO COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/18/2018: CROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES) -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/18/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Summons on Cross Complaint -

4/18/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

4/25/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

CoverSheet -

2/6/2018: CoverSheet -

Summons -

2/6/2018: Summons -

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • Hearing03/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Hearing03/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Agavni Tishchyan (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DANIEL MONROY (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Agavni Tishchyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Trial Setting Conference) of 06/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel Monroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel Monroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daniel Monroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Monroy (Plaintiff); Christopher Sola (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Daniel Monroy (Plaintiff); Christopher Sola (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC692900    Hearing Date: June 29, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

daniel monroy, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

agavni tishchyan, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC692900, related to

19STLC01372

Hearing Date: June 29, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION TO consolidate

Defendant Agavni Tishchyan (“Defendant”) moves to consolidate this case with Safeway Insurance Company v. Monroy, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2019, No. 19STLC01372) for all purposes. Per Local Rule 3.3, subdivision (g), “Cases may not be consolidated unless they are in the same department. A motion to consolidate two or more cases may be noticed and heard after the cases, initially filed in different departments, have been related into a single department, or if the cases were already assigned to that department.” (Super. Ct. L.A. County, Local Rules, rule 3.3(g)(1).) The Court has already related these cases, and all are pending in this department. Consolidation is warranted as the cases arise out of the same motor vehicle collision. The motion is not opposed. Accordingly, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion to consolidate this case with Safeway Insurance Company v. Monroy, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2019, No. 19STLC01372) is granted. The cases are consolidated for all purposes. All hearing dates in Safeway Insurance Company v. Monroy, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2019, No. 19STLC01372) are vacated.

The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: March 9, 2021, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: March 23, 2021, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. The moving party shall provide notice.

DATED: June 29, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC692900    Hearing Date: March 17, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

daniel monroy, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

agavni tishchyan, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC692900, related to

19STLC01372

Hearing Date: March 17, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION TO consolidate

Defendant Agavni Tishchyan (“Defendant”) moves to consolidate this case with Safeway Insurance Company v. Monroy, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2019, No. 19STLC01372) for all purposes. Per Local Rule 3.3, subdivision (g), “Cases may not be consolidated unless they are in the same department. A motion to consolidate two or more cases may be noticed and heard after the cases, initially filed in different departments, have been related into a single department, or if the cases were already assigned to that department.” (Super. Ct. L.A. County, Local Rules, rule 3.3(g)(1).) The Court has already related these cases, and all are pending in this department. Consolidation is warranted as the cases arise out of the same motor vehicle collision. The motion is not opposed. Accordingly, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion to consolidate this case with Safeway Insurance Company v. Monroy, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2019, No. 19STLC01372) is granted. The cases are consolidated for all purposes. All hearing dates in Safeway Insurance Company v. Monroy, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2019, No. 19STLC01372) are vacated.

On its own motion, the Court vacates the March 30, 2020 trial date in this action. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: September 2, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: September 16, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. The moving party shall provide notice.

DATED: January 30, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court