This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2023 at 03:46:10 (UTC).

DANIEL MILLER VS HOST HOTELS & RESORTS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 DANIEL MILLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOST HOTELS RESORTS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE HWANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4810

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANNE HWANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLER DANIEL

Defendants

ALLIED PRIVATE INVESTIGATION & SECURITY SERVICES INC.

HOST HOTELS & RESORTS INC.

OAKTREE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT L.P.

TRINITY FUND ADVISORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLEITMAN JEFFREY P.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/8/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/8/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/8/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/8/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/8/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - Dismissal

8/8/2023: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

8/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 08/08/2023

8/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 08/08/2023

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Daniel Miller on 02/08/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581 (b)(3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Jeffrey P. Fleitman (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Jeffrey P. Fleitman Law Offices to Law Offices of Jeffrey P. Fleitman; Middle Name changed from P to P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketAddress for Jeffrey P. Fleitman (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32 updated: Result Date to 07/25/2023; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Daniel Miller (Plaintiff); As to: Host Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Defendant); Oaktree Capital Management, L.P. (Defendant); Trinity Fund Advisors LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less