This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 11:53:44 (UTC).

DANIEL MENDOZA-CONNER VS CITY OF REDONDO BEACH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 DANIEL MENDOZA-CONNER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF REDONDO BEACH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0481

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MENDOZA-CONNER DANIEL

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

CITY OF REDONDO BEACH

DOES 1 TO 50

OZKAN ARIF M

OZKAN HAKIMA

ROES 1 THROUGH 100

BRIAN K. MOODY AND LESLIE K. MOODY FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HULTIN CASEY ANNE

CHANG DIANE RAE-SHIN

Defendant Attorneys

DEZIEL COLLEEN ANN

FRANK ALEXANDER ASCH

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/21/2023: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/10/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/17/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/17/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/17/2023: Cross-Complaint

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/25/2023: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

5/8/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/19/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/19/2023: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

5/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • Hearing07/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Redondo Beach (Cross-Complainant); As to: Brian K. Moody and Leslie K. Moody Family Trust (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: City of Redondo Beach (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: City of Redondo Beach (Defendant); As to: Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Hakima Ozkan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: City of Redondo Beach (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Arif M Ozkan (Cross-Complainant); Hakima Ozkan (Cross-Complainant); As to: ROES 1 through 100 (Cross-Defendant); City of Redondo Beach (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Hakima Ozkan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Hakima Ozkan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Hakima Ozkan (Defendant); As to: ROES 1 through 100 (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Hakima Ozkan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Daniel Mendoza-Conner (Plaintiff); As to: Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Service Date: 04/04/2023; Service Cost: 159.08; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Daniel Mendoza-Conner (Plaintiff); As to: City of Redondo Beach (Defendant); Service Date: 04/04/2023; Service Cost: 159.08; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Daniel Mendoza-Conner (Plaintiff); As to: Hakima Ozkan (Defendant); Service Date: 04/04/2023; Service Cost: 159.08; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Daniel Mendoza-Conner (Plaintiff); As to: City of Redondo Beach (Defendant); Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Hakima Ozkan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Daniel Mendoza-Conner (Plaintiff); As to: City of Redondo Beach (Defendant); Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Hakima Ozkan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Daniel Mendoza-Conner (Plaintiff); As to: City of Redondo Beach (Defendant); Arif M Ozkan (Defendant); Hakima Ozkan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less