This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2020 at 17:45:59 (UTC).

DANIEL MCGUIRE VS SIGNATURE MOTORSPORTS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 DANIEL MCGUIRE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SIGNATURE MOTORSPORTS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6271

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCGUIRE DANIEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

SIGNATURE MOTORSPORTS LLC

HERNANDEZ DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SUGARS STEVEN L. ESQ.

SUGARS STEVEN LEE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MILLER JENNIFER E. ESQ.

YEE DOUGLAS S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

1/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/13/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED; DECLARATION OF STEVEN L. SUGARS

9/24/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED; DECLARATION OF STEVEN L. SUGARS

Notice of Ruling

9/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

9/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; HE...)

9/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED; HE...)

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

8/7/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL

8/7/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS

7/5/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS

Proof of Service by Mail

7/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Ruling

5/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Dismiss

2/13/2019: Motion to Dismiss

Motion for Order - Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Request for Productions

10/18/2018: Motion for Order - Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Request for Productions

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

6/25/2018: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

6/25/2018: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/25/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

5/18/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Daniel McGuire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docketat 11:33 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 01/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Signature Motorsports, LLC (Defendant); David Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketOpposition (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS; DECLARATION OF STEVEN L. SUGARS); Filed by Daniel McGuire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Filed by Signature Motorsports, LLC (Defendant); David Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Signature Motorsports, LLC (Defendant); David Hernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Daniel McGuire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel McGuire (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706271    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

daniel mcguire,

Plaintiff,

v.

signature motorsports, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC706271

Hearing Date: December 16, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to dismiss

Defendants David Hernandez and Signature Motorsports, LLC (“Defendants”) move to dismiss the complaint of Plaintiff Daniel McGuire (“Plaintiff”) as a terminating sanction because Plaintiff did not pay discovery sanctions of $980, as ordered by the Court. The Court has discretion to impose terminating sanction when a party willfully disobeys a discovery order. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2023.010, subd. (g), 2030.290, subd. (c).) The Court may impose a terminating sanction by dismissing the party’s action. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.030, subd. (d).) However, the Court may not order a terminating sanction based upon the failure to pay a discovery sanction. “[A] terminating sanction issued solely because of a failure to pay a monetary discovery sanction is never justified.” (Newland v. Superior Court (1995) 40 Cal.App.4th 608, 615.) Accordingly, the motion is denied. The Court also declines to impose additional monetary sanctions. Defendants’ remedy is to enforce the prior sanctions order as a monetary judgment. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 680.230. 680.270, 699.510, subd. (a).)

Conclusion and Order

Defendants’ motion for terminating sanctions is denied. The Court declines to impose additional monetary sanctions. Defendants are ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: December 16, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court