Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2017 at 15:58:01 (UTC).

DANIEL HELFMAN VS LUIS JAVIER RUIZ

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 DANIEL HELFMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS JAVIER RUIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5698

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HELFMAN DANIEL

Defendants and Respondents

RUIZ LUIS JAVIER

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KALFAYAN MERJANIAN LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

3/29/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less