This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 04:06:16 (UTC).

DANIEL GRYCZMAN VS CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 DANIEL GRYCZMAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3748

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRYCZMAN DANIEL

Defendant

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY DBA MERCURY INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNALD BRANDON CLAUS

Defendant Attorney

HEMPHILL LORA D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/3/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

General Denial

8/2/2021: General Denial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/25/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • Hearing01/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Daniel Gryczman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Daniel Gryczman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Daniel Gryczman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Daniel Gryczman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Gryczman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniel Gryczman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Gryczman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Gryczman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNALD BRANDON CLAUS