This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2021 at 00:15:02 (UTC).

DANIEL FLORES VS URBAN COMMONS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 DANIEL FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against URBAN COMMONS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1128

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES DANIEL

Defendants

THE QUEEN MARY

URBAN COMMONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUSHAN F. ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

PI General Order

4/1/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Daniel Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniel Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE QUEEN MARY is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOUSHAN F. ANTHONY