This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 05:25:51 (UTC).

DANIEL FEHSENFELD VS SAPIENT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 DANIEL FEHSENFELD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SAPIENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4188

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEHSENFELD DANIEL

Defendant

SAPIENT CORPORATION DBA SAPIENTRAZORFISH DBA SAPIENTNITRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL TIMOTHY A

HALL TIMOTHY ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/2/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Daniel Fehsenfeld (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prejudice, Entire Action); Filed by Daniel Fehsenfeld (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Daniel Fehsenfeld (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Fehsenfeld (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniel Fehsenfeld (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Fehsenfeld (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL TIMOTHY A