This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2022 at 06:19:29 (UTC).

DANIEL ELIHU, AN INDIVIDUAL VS KELSEY MORGAN PORTER, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 DANIEL ELIHU, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KELSEY MORGAN PORTER, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1131

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIHU AN INDIVIDUAL DANIEL

Defendant

PORTER AN INDIVIDUAL KELSEY MORGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIDSON LAURA LYNN

Defendant Attorney

GALES ALISSA J.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/11/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/11/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/11/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Complaint

1/11/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/15/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

4/15/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2025
  • Hearing01/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • Hearing07/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KELSEY MORGAN PORTER, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by KELSEY MORGAN PORTER, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by DANIEL ELIHU, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DANIEL ELIHU, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DANIEL ELIHU, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DANIEL ELIHU, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DANIEL ELIHU, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALES ALISSA J