This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 11:48:02 (UTC).

DANIEL DAVOUDI, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 DANIEL DAVOUDI, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5341

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVOUDI AN INDIVIDUAL DANIEL

YAGHOUBI AN INDIVIDUAL MANIJEH

Cross Defendants and Defendants

BUCHMAN AN INDIVIDUAL CARY

BUCHMAN AN INDIVIDUAL LYNDA G.

CARY BUCHMAN AND LYNDA G. BUCHMAN AS TRUSTEES OF THE BUCHMAN TRUST

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANGOLI SHAWN L.

Defendant Attorney

KAHRAMANIAN LALA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/15/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/14/2022: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/30/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2024
  • Hearing12/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a Governmental Entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a Governmental Entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, a Governmental Entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DANIEL DAVOUDI, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DANIEL DAVOUDI, an Individual (Plaintiff); MANIJEH YAGHOUBI, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DANIEL DAVOUDI, an Individual (Plaintiff); MANIJEH YAGHOUBI, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DANIEL DAVOUDI, an Individual (Plaintiff); MANIJEH YAGHOUBI, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANGOLI SHAHRAM