Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 01:37:40 (UTC).

DANIEL CORTES MARTINEZ VS MARC NUNEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 DANIEL CORTES MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MARC NUNEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1520

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ DANIEL CORTES

Defendants

NUNEZ MARC

TOTAL DESIGN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN SARAH H.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/24/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/30/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/26/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 04/12/2021

4/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 04/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/16/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • Hearing08/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 04/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniel Cortes Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN, SARAH H.